Tricks
Maths Tricks

Math Tricks That Will Blow Your Mind

Hello guys we are back with some interesting tricks that will help you all boosting your mathematical skills.Below tricks will help you perform calculations easily without the need of a calculator.You can Impress your teachers, parents or friends by using this tricks.So have a look at them.

Memorizing Pi

This is a very cool trick to remember the first seven digits of pi, count the number of letters in each word of the sentence:

“How I wish I could calculate pi.”

This gives 3.141592.(There are various tricks to remember value of pi correctly but i found this trick much better.)



Multiply Large Numbers in Your Head

TricksTo easily multiply two double digit numbers, use their distance from 100 to simplify the math:

  1. Subtract each number from 100.
  2. Add these values together.
  3. 100 minus this number is the first part of the answer.
  4. Multiply the digits from Step 1 to get the second part of the answer.

 

 

Multiplying by 6

If you multiply 6 by an even number, the answer will end with the same digit. The number in the tens place will be half of the number in the ones place.

Example: 6 x 6 = 36

Superb Divisibility Rules

You’ve got 210 chocolates and want to know whether or not you can split them evenly within your group. Rather than using calculator, we can use these simple shortcuts to calculate on our head:



  • Divisible by 2 if the last digit is a multiple of 2 (210).
  • Divisible by 3 if the sum of the digits is divisible by 3 (522 because the digits add up to 9, which is divisible by 3).
  • Divisible by 4 if the last two digits are divisible by 4 (2540 because 40 is divisible by 4).
  • Divisible by 5 if the last digit is 0 or 5 (9905).
  • Divisible by 6 if it passes the rules for both 2 and 3 (408).
  • Divisible by 9 if the sum of the digits is divisible by 9 (6390 since 6 + 3 + 9 + 0 = 18, which is divisible by 9).
  • Divisible by 10 if the number ends in a 0 (8910).
  • Divisible by 12 if the rules for divisibility by 3 and 4 apply.

Example: The 210 chocolates may be evenly distributed into groups of 2, 3, 6, 10.

If anyone of you have some tricks then please comment so that everyone can boost their mathematical skills.

Maths Tricks

Calculate Faster Than a Calculator

Trick 1

First of all i would like to tell you that this trick will be applied under some restrictions.

  • The first digits of both numbers must be the same
  • The sum of last digit of numbers must equal to 10

Lets Understand this trick with some examples:-

Example 1:- 26 x 24 

Solution :- 

  1. Start by taking first digit of the first number and multiply it by one more than it which will give you first digit(s) of the answer. That is 2 multiplied by (2+1) = 6. It means that 6 is the Most significant digit of the answer.
  2. Now multiply last digit of both the numbers i.e., 6 x 4 = 24.

Combine the result of step 1 and step 2 and the answer for 26 x 24 = 624.

Example 2:- 47 x 43 

Solution:- 

  1. Do similar as we have done above i.e., multiply first digit of first number with one more than it. Hence 4 x 5 = 20. 20 is the MSD (Most significant digit) of the answer.
  2. Multiply last digit of both the numbers 7 x 3 = 21

Combine the result of step 1 and step 2 and the answer for 47 x 43 = 2021.



This trick can also be applied on 3 digit number as well. Lets take an example

Example 3:- 132 x 138 

Solution:- 

  1. Multiply 13 by one more than it i.e., 13 x 14 = 182. Hence 182 is MSD (Most Significant Digit) of the answer.
  2. Multiply last digit of both the numbers 2 x 8 = 16.

Combine the result of step 1 and step 2 and the answer for 132 x 138 = 18216.

Trick 2 

 

To multiply by 9,try this:

(1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.
(2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it would be the 4th finger and so on.
(3) the answer is 27 … READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.

This works for anything up to 9 x 10 

In case you have any doubt regarding above tricks please let us know in the comment box below.