Maths Tricks

Table of any number (The Easy Way)

How to write Table of any two digit number ?

Most of the students are not good at memorizing multiplication  table of number after 15 and ends up not solving the problems just because if they multiply each number then it will take more time then the trick discussed below. So have a look at this trick which is much easier then the regular method of deriving tables.

Example:- Table of 25

First write down table of 2 then write down table of 5 besides table of 2

2 5 25

4 10 (4+1) 50

6 15 (6+1) 75

8 20 (8+2) 100

10 25 (10+2) 125

12 30 (12+3) 150



14 35 (14+3) 175

16 40 (16+4) 200

18 45 (18+4) 225

20 50 (20+5) 250

Example :-  87

First write down table of 8 then write down table of 7 besides table of 8

8 7 87

16 14 (16+1) 174

24 21 (24+2) 261

32 28 (32+2) 348

40 35 (40+3) 435

48 42 (48+4) 522

56 49 (56+4) 609

64 56 (64+5) 696

72 63 (72+6) 783

80 70 (80+7) 870



Lets take one more example :- 93

First write down table of 9 then write down table of 3 besides table of 9

9 3 93Table

18 6 (18+0) 186

27 9(27+0)279

36 12(36+1)372

45 15(45+1)465

54 18(54+1)558

63 21(63+2)651

72 24(72+2)744

81 27(81+2)837

90 30(90+3)930

Now in exams you don’t have to sit like this and think the multiplication tables of any two digit number.



For more tricks to multiply any number within blink of eyes Click here..!!

For tricks that can blow your mind Click here ..!!

Multiplication Rules

As we all memorize tables from 2 to 15 very easily but can’t multiply bigger numbers at a great speed like multiplying 2682 * 14 , 7541 * 18 etc so here are some multiplication rules if one can remember then he/she can find product very easily and faster . So remember following rules and practice them as follows :-

Multiply by 5: Multiply by 10 and divide by 2.
Multiply by 6: Sometimes multiplying by 3 and then 2 is easy.
Multiply by 9: Multiply by 10 and subtract the original number.
Multiply by 12: Multiply by 10 and add twice the original number.



Multiply by 13: Multiply by 3 and add 10 times original number.
Multiply by 14: Multiply by 7 and then multiply by 2
Multiply by 15: Multiply by 10 and add 5 times the original number, as above.
Multiply by 16: You can double four times, if you want to. Or you can multiply by 8 and then by 2.

Multiply by 17: Multiply by 7 and add 10 times original number.
Multiply by 19: Multiply by 20 and subtract the original number.
Multiply by 24: Multiply by 8 and then multiply by 3.
Multiply by 27: Multiply by 30 and subtract 3 times the original number (which is obvious from the first step).
Multiply by 45: Multiply by 50 and subtract 5 times the original number (which is obvious from the first step).
Multiply by 90: Multiply by 9 (as above) and put a zero on the right.
Multiply by 99: Multiply by 100 and subtract the original number.



Comment below in case you find any problem in this trick.

Please share this trick of writing table of any two digit number and help them in overcoming fear of mathematics.

Maths Tricks

Calculate Faster Than a Calculator

Trick 1

First of all i would like to tell you that this trick will be applied under some restrictions.

  • The first digits of both numbers must be the same
  • The sum of last digit of numbers must equal to 10

Lets Understand this trick with some examples:-

Example 1:- 26 x 24 

Solution :- 

  1. Start by taking first digit of the first number and multiply it by one more than it which will give you first digit(s) of the answer. That is 2 multiplied by (2+1) = 6. It means that 6 is the Most significant digit of the answer.
  2. Now multiply last digit of both the numbers i.e., 6 x 4 = 24.

Combine the result of step 1 and step 2 and the answer for 26 x 24 = 624.

Example 2:- 47 x 43 

Solution:- 

  1. Do similar as we have done above i.e., multiply first digit of first number with one more than it. Hence 4 x 5 = 20. 20 is the MSD (Most significant digit) of the answer.
  2. Multiply last digit of both the numbers 7 x 3 = 21

Combine the result of step 1 and step 2 and the answer for 47 x 43 = 2021.



This trick can also be applied on 3 digit number as well. Lets take an example

Example 3:- 132 x 138 

Solution:- 

  1. Multiply 13 by one more than it i.e., 13 x 14 = 182. Hence 182 is MSD (Most Significant Digit) of the answer.
  2. Multiply last digit of both the numbers 2 x 8 = 16.

Combine the result of step 1 and step 2 and the answer for 132 x 138 = 18216.

Trick 2 

 

To multiply by 9,try this:

(1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.
(2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it would be the 4th finger and so on.
(3) the answer is 27 … READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.

This works for anything up to 9 x 10 

In case you have any doubt regarding above tricks please let us know in the comment box below.